Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Vincenzo Toti

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622¹BornRome
5 Jun 167250.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 167250.4AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
24 Jul 167250.5Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
28 Feb 169068.1DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Vincenzo Toti:
Bishop Carlo Vincenzo Toti (died ) Bishop of Gubbio

  • a priest for 17.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 197
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 12 Apr 2015