Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Stefano Ugolini

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Corinthus

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Mar 1666AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
11 Apr 1666Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
18 Apr 1667AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
10 Jul 1681DiedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople

MicroData Summary for Stefano Ugolini:
Patriarch Stefano Ugolini (died ) Titular Patriarch of Corinthus

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 163
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015