Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ottaviano Carafa

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Apr 1660AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
25 Apr 1660Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
14 Apr 1666DiedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)

MicroData Summary for Ottaviano Carafa:
Archbishop Ottaviano Carafa (died ) Titular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 276
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015