Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gennaro Sanfelice

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622¹BornNapoli
21 Nov 166139.8AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
30 Nov 166139.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
19 Feb 1694³72.1DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Sanfelice:
Archbishop Gennaro Sanfelice (born 1622, died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 123, Number 750
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 171
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1661, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015