Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stefan Knezevic (de Comitibus), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1625¹BornCiprovci
5 Apr 167752.3AppointedArchbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria
25 Apr 167752.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria
28 Oct 169166.8DiedArchbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia), Bulgaria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefan Knezevic (de Comitibus):
Archbishop Stefan Knezevic (de Comitibus) O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of Sardica (Sredek, Sofia)

  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013