Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar Gasparini, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

Titular Bishop of Spiga(z) (or Pegae)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1623¹BornCastignano
5 Apr 167754.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Spiga(z) (or Pegae)
25 Apr 167754.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Spiga(z) (or Pegae)
31 May 167754.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
22 Aug 170582.6DiedTitular Bishop of Spiga(z) (or Pegae)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Gasparini:
Bishop Gaspar Gasparini O.F.M. Conv. (born 1623, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 361
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015