Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Tamantini

Deceased

Bishop of Cagli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1621BornRoma
28 Dec 166443.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 167049.6AppointedBishop of Cagli, Italy
28 Oct 167049.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cagli, Italy
Mar 1685³64.0DiedBishop of Cagli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Tamantini:
Bishop Andrea Tamantini (born ) Bishop of Cagli

  • a priest for 20.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 137
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1670, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 11 Apr 2015