Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolò d’Arcano

Deceased

Bishop of Comacchio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1637¹Born
9 Nov 167033.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 167033.9AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
4 Jan 167134.0Ordained BishopBishop of Comacchio, Italy
1 Jan 171477.0DiedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolò d’Arcano
Bishop Nicolò d’Arcano (born 1637, died ) Bishop of Comacchio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCesene

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast