Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raimondo Ferretti

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1650BornAncona
10 Mar 167423.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jul 169039.6AppointedBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
6 Aug 169039.7Ordained BishopBishop of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
9 Jan 169241.1AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
24 Mar 171968.3DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raimondo Ferretti:
Archbishop Raimondo Ferretti (born , died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 329, and Page 330
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1690, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015