Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leone Strozzi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹BornFlorence
10 Jul 169052.5AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
6 Aug 169052.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
21 Jun 170062.4AppointedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy
4 Oct 170365.7DiedArchbishop of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Leone Strozzi:
Archbishop Leone Strozzi O.S.B. (born 1638, died ) Archbishop of Firenze {Florence}

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 203, and Page 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1690, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015