Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcello Cardinal Santacroce

Deceased

Bishop of Tivoli, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1619Born
19 Feb 165232.6Elevated to Cardinal
12 Mar 165232.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
14 Oct 165233.3AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
28 Oct 165233.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
19 Dec 167455.5DiedBishop of Tivoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marcello Santacroce
Marcello Cardinal Santacroce (born , died ) Bishop of Tivoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 22.1 years
  • a cardinal for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Feb 1652
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 10 Nov 2018

Quantcast