Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi de Gennaro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cava (de’ Tirreni)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1604¹BornNapoli
5 Apr 166056.2AppointedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
11 Apr 166056.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy
30 Jun 167066.4ResignedBishop of Cava (de’ Tirreni), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Luigi de Gennaro:
Bishop Luigi de Gennaro (born 1604) Bishop Emeritus of Cava (de’ Tirreni)

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 122, Number 745
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 144
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015