Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano Sculco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gerace, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1638¹Born
22 Dec 167032.9AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
4 Jan 167133.0Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
20 Apr 168648.3ResignedBishop of Gerace, Italy
9 Nov 170365.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Gerace, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano Sculco
Bishop Stefano Sculco (born 1638, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gerace

EventPlace
Birth PlacePapanice Cotronen

  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 219
  • ob/c2+: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1671, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast