Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ranuccio (Ranuzio) Scotti Douglas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Borgo San Donnino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1597Born
22 Mar 162729.6AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
18 Apr 162729.7Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
30 May 162729.8InstalledBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
22 May 163032.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
4 May 163941.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
8 Aug 163942.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
9 Mar 164143.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
5 Aug 164548.0ResignedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
10 May 166163.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Borgo San Donnino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ranuccio (Ranuzio) Scotti Douglas (VIAF: 61768136)
Archbishop Ranuccio (Ranuzio) Scotti Douglas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Borgo San Donnino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParma, Diocese of Parma
Ordained BishopSant’Andrea della Valle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlacePiacenza, Diocese of Piacenza
Buried Place (Original)Santa Rita, Church, Piacenza, Diocese of Piacenza

  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,839
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 124
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 8
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 286
  • r: CB, 17 Oct 2016
  • d/loc: AT, 24 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 25 Jan 2019

Quantcast