Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gian Giacomo Cristoforo

Deceased

Bishop of Lacedonia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588¹Born
12 Apr 164961.2AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
18 Apr 164961.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
8 May 164961.3DiedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gian Giacomo Cristoforo
Bishop Gian Giacomo Cristoforo (born 1588, died ) Bishop of Lacedonia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiaggine
Ordained BishopBorghese Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for .0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 215
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 36
  • ob/c2+: AT, 2 Aug 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,026

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018