Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Michel Cardinal Mazarin, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1605BornPescina, Italy
164539.3SelectedArchbishop of Aix, France
10 Jul 164539.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix, France
23 Jul 164539.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Aix, France
7 Oct 164742.1Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 164742.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
31 Aug 164843.0DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

MicroData Summary for Michel Mazarin:
Cardinal Michel Mazarin O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
  • a cardinal for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Oct 1647
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 110, Number 669
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013