Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo (Jérome) Cardinal Grimaldi-Cavalleroni

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1595BornGenoa, Italy
25 Feb 164145.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
3 Mar 164145.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
27 Mar 164145.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
Jun 1643³47.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
13 Jul 164347.8Elevated to Cardinal
17 Oct 164449.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
20 Sep 164853.0SelectedArchbishop of Aix, France
30 Aug 165560.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix, France
11 Oct 165560.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
28 Jan 167579.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
4 Nov 168590.2DiedArchbishop of Aix, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo (Jérome) Grimaldi-Cavalleroni:
Girolamo (Jérome) Cardinal Grimaldi-Cavalleroni (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix

  • a bishop for 44.6 years
  • a cardinal for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 311, and Page 89
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1641, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015