Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Picquet

Deceased

Bishop of Baghdad, Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1626Born
5 May 167751.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
26 Sep 167751.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesaropolis
26 Apr 168357.0AppointedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
26 Aug 168660.3DiedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq

MicroData Summary for François Picquet
Bishop François Picquet (born , died ) Bishop of Baghdad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 110, and Page 133
  • ob/c2+: CB, 3 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018