Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas de Valavoir (Vallavoire)

Deceased

Bishop of Riez


Events

DateEventTitle
10 May 1652SelectedBishop of Riez, France
14 Oct 1652ConfirmedBishop of Riez, France
8 Dec 1652Ordained BishopBishop of Riez, France
28 Apr 1685DiedBishop of Riez, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas de Valavoir (Vallavoire):
Bishop Nicolas de Valavoir (Vallavoire) (died ) Bishop of Riez

  • a bishop for 32.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 294

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015