Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Faure

Deceased

Bishop of Amiens, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1612Born
6 Mar 165138.3SelectedBishop of Glandèves, France
9 Jun 165138.5ConfirmedBishop of Glandèves, France
3 Sep 165138.8Ordained BishopBishop of Glandèves, France
28 Mar 165340.3SelectedBishop of Amiens, France
23 Mar 165441.3ConfirmedBishop of Amiens, France
11 May 168774.5DiedBishop of Amiens, France

MicroData Summary for François Faure
Bishop François Faure (born , died ) Bishop of Amiens

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Quiterie de Chadurie

  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 80, and Page 195
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018