Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean du Haut de Sallies

Deceased

Bishop of Lescar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1594Born
30 Sep 165864.7AppointedBishop of Lescar, France
1 Dec 165864.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lescar, France
18 Apr 168187.2DiedBishop of Lescar, France

MicroData Summary for Jean du Haut de Sallies:
Bishop Jean du Haut de Sallies (died ) Bishop of Lescar

  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 9 Feb 2015