Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Bedacier, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Metz

Titular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹BornTours
21 Oct 164851.8SelectedAuxiliary Bishop of Metz, France
1 Mar 164952.1ConfirmedAuxiliary Bishop of Metz, France
1 Mar 164952.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
18 Jul 164952.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
Oct 1660³63.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Metz, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Bedacier:
Bishop Pierre de Bedacier O.S.B. , Auxiliary Bishop of Metz

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 26 Mar 2015