Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Humbert Ancelin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tulle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1650¹BornParis
4 Oct 168030.7SelectedBishop of Tulle, France
17 Mar 168131.2ConfirmedBishop of Tulle, France
18 May 168131.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
1702²52.0ResignedBishop of Tulle, France
26 Jun 172070.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Tulle, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Humbert Ancelin:
Bishop Humbert Ancelin (born 1650, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tulle

  • a bishop for 39.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 396
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015