Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Le Bel, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Bethleem


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1661¹BornBeauvais
11 Dec 171352.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bethleem
4 Feb 171453.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bethleem
8 Oct 173877.7DiedTitular Bishop of Bethleem

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Le Bel:
Bishop Louis Le Bel O.F.M. (born 1661, died ) Titular Bishop of Bethleem

  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 119
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1714, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015