Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Raphael Levacovich, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Achrida (Ochrida), Bulgaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1607¹Born
27 May 164740.4AppointedArchbishop of Achrida (Ochrida), Bulgaria
2 Jun 164740.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Achrida (Ochrida), Bulgaria
1650²43.0DiedArchbishop of Achrida (Ochrida), Bulgaria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raphael Levacovich
Archbishop Raphael Levacovich O.F.M. Obs. (born 1607, died 1650) Archbishop of Achrida (Ochrida)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLatroberstcha

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 67
  • ob/c2+: CB, 4 Dec 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017