Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marin Ibrišimović, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Beograd {Belgrade}, Serbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹Born
7 Oct 164747.7AppointedBishop of Beograd {Belgrade}, Serbia
13 Oct 164747.7Ordained BishopBishop of Beograd {Belgrade}, Serbia
21 Jan 165050.0DiedBishop of Beograd {Belgrade}, Serbia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marin Ibrišimović
Bishop Marin Ibrišimović O.F.M. Obs. (born 1600, died ) Bishop of Beograd {Belgrade}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePožega, Diocese of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo in Panisperna, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlacePožega, Diocese of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
Buried Place (Original)Convent of St. Agustin, Velika, Diocese of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 111
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 25
  • b/c2+: AT, 10 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017