Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pompeo Mignucci, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Acquapendente, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹Born
22 Aug 161720.6Ordained PriestPriest of Orden de San Jerónimo
16 Sep 164750.7AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
29 Sep 164750.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
10 Jan 165053.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Acquapendente, Italy
Oct 1654³57.7DiedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pompeo Mignucci
Archbishop Pompeo Mignucci O.S.H. (born 1597, died Oct 1654) Bishop of Acquapendente

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOffida

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 291, and Page 88
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 111, Number 677
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1647, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017