Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe (Francisco Maria) Sanfelice

Deceased

Archbishop of Cosenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹BornNapoli
25 May 164934.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Aug 165035.6AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
16 Oct 165035.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
13 Apr 165237.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
Sep 1659³44.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
20 Nov 166045.8DiedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe (Francisco Maria) Sanfelice (VIAF: 61612489)
Archbishop Giuseppe (Francisco Maria) Sanfelice (born 1615, died ) Archbishop of Cosenza

  • a priest for 11.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 113, Number 689
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 171
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1650, Number 26
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016