Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Vidoni (Sr.)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lodi

Cardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1610BornCremona
13 Jul 164433.6AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
9 Oct 164433.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
28 May 165241.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
5 Apr 166049.4Elevated to Cardinal
5 Apr 166049.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
4 Jul 166150.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
16 Jun 166958.6ResignedBishop of Lodi, Italy
13 Mar 167362.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
5 Jan 168170.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Vidoni (Sr.):
Pietro Cardinal Vidoni (Sr.) (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lodi

  • a bishop for 36.2 years
  • a cardinal for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Apr 1660
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 216
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015