Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nestor Rita

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Sebaste in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605Born
2 Dec 166964.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia
18 May 167065.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zenopolis in Lycia
20 Aug 167065.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sebaste in Cilicia
17 Mar 168782.2DiedTitular Archbishop of Sebaste in Cilicia

MicroData Summary for Nestor Rita:
Archbishop Nestor Rita (died ) Titular Archbishop of Sebaste in Cilicia

  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 347, and Page 422

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013