Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Domaniewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

Titular Bishop of Margarita


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Jun 1653AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
9 Jun 1653AppointedTitular Bishop of Margarita
15 Feb 1654Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Margarita
1677¹DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Domaniewski:
Bishop Stanisław Domaniewski (died 1677) Auxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 231
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 18
  • ob: CB, 29 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 1 Aug 2015