Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maciej Bystrom (Bystram)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

Titular Bishop of Argos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1602¹BornCielętach
1635¹33.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 165957.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
22 Sep 165957.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Argos
23 Jan 166159.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Argos
5 Aug 167775.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maciej Bystrom (Bystram):
Bishop Maciej Bystrom (Bystram) (born 1602, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 94
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,950
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1661, Number 1
  • c2d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015