Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcin Szyszkowski

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1554²BornIłży
24 Nov 160349.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
24 Nov 160349.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Christopolis
9 May 160450.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Christopolis
Jun 1604²50.4SucceededBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
18 Jul 160753.5AppointedBishop of Płock, Poland
17 Oct 161662.7AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
30 Apr 163076.3DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcin Szyszkowski:
Bishop Marcin Szyszkowski (died ) Bishop of Kraków

  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,895
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 224, and Page 150
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Feb 2015