Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kazimierz Florian Czartoryski

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹BornKlewań
23 Apr 165033.3SelectedBishop of Poznań, Poland
3 Oct 165033.7ConfirmedBishop of Poznań, Poland
29 Jan 165134.0Ordained BishopBishop of Poznań, Poland
31 May 165538.4ConfirmedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
27 Nov 167356.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
2 Jan 167457.0InstalledArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
15 May 167457.3DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Florian Czartoryski:
Archbishop Kazimierz Florian Czartoryski (died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 287, and Page 372
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 210
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015