Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Gaetano

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Rhodus


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Aug 1652AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
1 Sep 1652Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
28 Nov 1652AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
Dec 1654³ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
17 Mar 1670DiedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Gaetano
Archbishop Francesco Gaetano (died ) Titular Archbishop of Rhodus

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 296
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 115, Number 700
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 21
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016