Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista del Tinto, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1622BornAlvito
31 Dec 163917.5ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
15 Feb 166643.6AppointedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
22 Feb 166643.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trani, Italy
19 Oct 167654.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
19 May 168562.9DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista del Tinto:
Archbishop Giovanni Battista del Tinto O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 147
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 341
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Nov 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015