Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie de Suarès

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vaison


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1599BornAvignon
18 Jul 163334.0AppointedBishop of Vaison, France
31 Jul 163334.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vaison, France
17 Mar 166666.6ResignedBishop of Vaison, France
7 Dec 167778.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Vaison, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie de Suarès:
Bishop Joseph-Marie de Suarès (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vaison

  • a bishop for 44.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 360
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015