Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Vincent de Tulles

Deceased

Bishop of Lavaur


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Mar 1637AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Orange, France
16 Mar 1637AppointedTitular Bishop of Dioclea
13 Apr 1637Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dioclea
Oct 1640³SucceededBishop of Orange, France
27 May 1647AppointedBishop of Lavaur, France
4 Dec 1668DiedBishop of Lavaur, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Vincent de Tulles:
Bishop Jean-Vincent de Tulles (died ) Bishop of Lavaur

  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 406
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 175, and Page 360
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 102
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 98, Number 593

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013