Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Louis Cazet de Vautorte

Deceased

Bishop of Vannes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹BornLaval
14 May 165538.3AppointedBishop of Lectoure, France
21 Sep 165538.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lectoure, France
28 Jan 167154.0SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
22 Jun 167154.4ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
13 Dec 168770.9DiedBishop of Vannes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Louis Cazet de Vautorte:
Bishop Pierre-Louis Cazet de Vautorte (died ) Bishop of Vannes

  • a bishop for 32.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015