Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

Archidioecesis Montis Pessulani (-Lotevensis-Biterrensis-Agathensis-Sancti Pontii Thomeriarum)



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Maguelonne
3rd CenturyErectedDiocese of Maguelonne (erected)
Diocese of Montpellier
27 March 1536Name ChangedDiocese of Maguelonne Diocese of Montpellier
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Agde (suppressed) Diocese of Montpellier
29 November 1801Territory AddedArchdiocese of Albi (suppressed) Diocese of Montpellier
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Lavaur (suppressed) Diocese of Montpellier
29 November 1801Territory AddedArchdiocese of Narbonne (suppressed) Diocese of Carcassonne
Diocese of Montpellier
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières (suppressed) Diocese of Montpellier
29 November 1801Territory AddedDiocese of Vabres (suppressed) Diocese of Cahors
Diocese of Montpellier
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Montpellier
6 October 1822Territory LostDiocese of Montpellier Archdiocese of Albi
Diocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)
16 June 1877Name ChangedDiocese of Montpellier Diocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)
Archdiocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)
8 December 2002ElevatedDiocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières) Archdiocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)
1950440,000461,00095.4%3501124629521121,023416ap1951
1970525,000591,39788.8%3631034661,1262091,156410ap1971
1980600,000648,20292.6%3811675481,0941167842416ap1981
1990675,000721,00093.6%2991164151,6263196736385ap1991
1999601,626794,60375.7%2471233701,62615178636324ap2000
2000670,000900,00074.4%2481253731,79617181488324ap2001
2001670,000900,00074.4%2211243451,94218179475166ap2002
Archdiocese of Montpellier (-Lodève-Béziers-Agde-Saint-Pons-de-Thomières)
2002670,000900,00074.4%215572722,46319109505162ap2003
2003670,000900,00074.4%2121063182,10622155495173ap2004
2004670,0001,000,00067.0%2231253481,92523174485166ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Mar 2014