Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaillard (Galhard) de Saumate

Deceased

Archbishop of Arles, France


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Mar 1317AppointedBishop of Riez, France
12 Nov 1317AppointedBishop of Maguelonne, France
8 Feb 1318AppointedArchbishop of Arles, France
31 Jul 1323DiedArchbishop of Arles, France

MicroData Summary for Gaillard (Galhard) de Saumate
Archbishop Gaillard (Galhard) de Saumate (died ) Archbishop of Arles

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 103, and Page 320
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 417

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast