Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Norbert José Henri Turini

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1954 BornCannes
27 Jun 198227.8Ordained PriestPriest of Nice, France
30 Jun 200449.8AppointedBishop of Cahors, France
10 Oct 200450.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
18 Oct 201460.1AppointedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
18 Jan 201560.4InstalledBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Norbert José Henri Turini:
Bishop Norbert José Henri Turini (born ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Perpignan-Elne.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,704
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Oct 2014
  • i: CB, 18 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 19 Oct 2014