Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcel-Marie-Joseph-Henri-Paul Dubois

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Besançon

Titular Archbishop of Synnada in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1896BornLe Mans
18 May 192125.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 194852.1AppointedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
7 Oct 194852.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
10 Jun 195458.0AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
2 Jul 196670.1ResignedArchbishop of Besançon, France
2 Jul 196670.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Synnada in Mauretania
12 Jul 196771.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Marcel-Marie-Joseph-Henri-Paul Dubois:
Archbishop Marcel-Marie-Joseph-Henri-Paul Dubois (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Besançon

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015