Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Emmanuel Marquès

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1901BornGaillac-sur-Tarn
3 Apr 192624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
14 Apr 195351.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
14 Apr 195351.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sigus
24 Jun 195351.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sigus
5 Jan 195755.1AppointedArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
2 Aug 196159.7DiedArchbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Emmanuel Marquès:
Archbishop Jean-Emmanuel Marquès (born , died ) Archbishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur)

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013