Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marie-Joseph Puech

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Carcassonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1906BornMazamet
2 Jul 193024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
7 Jun 194741.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
7 Jun 194741.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Doliche
24 Sep 194741.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Doliche
18 Mar 195246.0AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
25 Aug 198276.5RetiredBishop of Carcassonne, France
1 Jan 199588.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Carcassonne, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie-Joseph Puech:
Bishop Pierre-Marie-Joseph Puech (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Carcassonne

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 47.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013