Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Berchmans-Marcel-Yves-Marie-Bernard Chabbert, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1920BornCastres
29 Jun 194726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
13 Apr 196746.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rabat, Morocco
13 Apr 196746.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Quaestoriana
7 Jul 196746.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Quaestoriana
15 Jan 196847.0SucceededArchbishop of Rabat, Morocco
17 Jul 198261.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Perpignan-Elne, France
16 Jan 199675.0RetiredBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
20 Sep 201695.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Berchmans-Marcel-Yves-Marie-Bernard Chabbert
Archbishop Jean-Berchmans-Marcel-Yves-Marie-Bernard Chabbert O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Perpignan-Elne

  • a priest for 69.2 years
  • a bishop for 49.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 21 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 22 Sep 2016