Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Maurice Cardinal Feltin

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Paris

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1883BornDelle
3 Jul 190926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Besançon, France
19 Dec 192744.6AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
11 Mar 192844.8Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
24 Mar 192844.9InstalledBishop of Troyes, France
16 Aug 193249.3AppointedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
16 Dec 193552.6AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
15 Aug 194966.3AppointedArchbishop of Paris, France
29 Oct 194966.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of France, Military
12 Jan 195369.7Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jan 195369.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
16 Jun 195471.1AppointedBishop of France, Faithful of Eastern Rites
1 Dec 196683.5RetiredArchbishop of Paris, France
1 Dec 196683.5RetiredVicar Apostolic of France, Military
1 Dec 196683.5RetiredBishop of France, Faithful of Eastern Rites
27 Sep 197592.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Maurice Feltin:
Cardinal Maurice Feltin (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Paris

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 47.5 years
  • a cardinal for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ab/mlfr: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 45, Page 248
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013