Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph-Marie-Eugène Cardinal Martin

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rouen

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Teresa al Corso d’Italia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1891BornOrléans
18 Dec 192029.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
6 Feb 194048.5AppointedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
2 Apr 194048.6Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
11 Oct 194857.2AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
22 Feb 196573.5Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 196573.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Teresa al Corso d’Italia
6 May 196876.7RetiredArchbishop of Rouen, France
21 Jan 197684.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie-Eugène Martin:
Cardinal Joseph-Marie-Eugène Martin (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rouen

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
  • a cardinal for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1940, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013