Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Rezzonico (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1724Born
11 Sep 175834.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
2 Oct 175834.4Elevated to Cardinal
22 Nov 175834.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
24 Jan 176338.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
24 Jan 176338.7AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
14 Dec 177248.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
15 Mar 177348.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
21 Mar 177348.9Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
29 Jan 177651.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
26 Jan 179974.7DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

MicroData Summary
Carlo Rezzonico (Jr.)
Carlo Cardinal Rezzonico (Jr.)
(born , died )
Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained BishopSaint-Marc, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Relatives
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
  • a cardinal for 40.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Sep 1758
  • ob/c2+: CB, 14 Jun 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 5
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 2, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 258, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 262, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 376, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 470, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,089, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.3, 19 May 2025; Data: 20 May 2025