Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Domenico StraticÚ, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1732Born
19 Jan 175522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Jul 177644.3AppointedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
21 Jul 177644.3Ordained BishopBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
20 Sep 178452.5AppointedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
Nov 1799³67.6DiedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Domenico StraticÚ
Bishop Giovanni Domenico StraticÚ O.P. (born , died Nov 1799) Bishop of Hvar (Lesina)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZadar

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 68, and Page 336
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1776, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018